Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0796 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024
Bill January 23, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024