Florida Senate - 2024 CS for CS for SB 796 By the Committees on Criminal Justice; and Governmental Oversight and Accountability; and Senator Avila 591-02984-24 2024796c2 1 A bill to be entitled 2 An act relating to anti-human trafficking; amending s. 3 16.618, F.S.; extending the future repeal date of the 4 direct-support organization for the Statewide Council 5 on Human Trafficking; amending ss. 394.875, 456.0341, 6 and 480.043, F.S.; revising the hotline telephone 7 number to be included in human trafficking awareness 8 signs; amending s. 509.096, F.S.; deleting obsolete 9 provisions; revising the hotline telephone number to 10 be included in human trafficking awareness signs; 11 amending s. 787.06, F.S.; requiring that contractors 12 with governmental entities attest that they do not use 13 coercion for labor or services; defining the term 14 governmental entity; amending s. 787.29, F.S.; 15 revising the hotline telephone number to be included 16 in human trafficking awareness signs; providing an 17 effective date. 18 19 Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 20 21 Section 1.Subsection (12) of section 16.618, Florida 22 Statutes, is amended to read: 23 16.618Direct-support organization. 24 (12)This section is repealed October 1, 2029 2024, unless 25 reviewed and saved from repeal by the Legislature. 26 Section 2.Paragraph (b) of subsection (8) of section 27 394.875, Florida Statutes, is amended to read: 28 394.875Crisis stabilization units, residential treatment 29 facilities, and residential treatment centers for children and 30 adolescents; authorized services; license required. 31 (8) 32 (b)Residential treatment centers for children and 33 adolescents must conspicuously place signs on their premises to 34 warn children and adolescents of the dangers of human 35 trafficking and to encourage the reporting of individuals 36 observed attempting to engage in human trafficking activity. The 37 signs must contain the telephone number for the Florida Human 38 Trafficking Hotline, 1-855-FLA-SAFE, the National Human 39 Trafficking Hotline or such other number that the Department of 40 Law Enforcement uses to detect and stop human trafficking. The 41 department, in consultation with the agency, shall specify, at a 42 minimum, the content of the signs by rule. 43 Section 3.Subsection (3) of section 456.0341, Florida 44 Statutes, is amended to read: 45 456.0341Requirements for instruction on human 46 trafficking.The requirements of this section apply to each 47 person licensed or certified under chapter 457; chapter 458; 48 chapter 459; chapter 460; chapter 461; chapter 463; chapter 465; 49 chapter 466; part II, part III, part V, or part X of chapter 50 468; chapter 480; or chapter 486. 51 (3)By January 1, 2025 2021, the licensees or 52 certificateholders shall post in their place of work in a 53 conspicuous place accessible to employees a sign at least 11 54 inches by 15 inches in size, printed in a clearly legible font 55 and in at least a 32-point type, which substantially states in 56 English and Spanish: 57 58 If you or someone you know is being forced to engage in an 59 activity and cannot leave, whether it is prostitution, 60 housework, farm work, factory work, retail work, restaurant 61 work, or any other activity, call the Florida Human Trafficking 62 Hotline, 1-855-FLA-SAFE, the National Human Trafficking Resource 63 Center at 888-373-7888 or text INFO or HELP to 233-733 to access 64 help and services. Victims of slavery and human trafficking are 65 protected under United States and Florida law. 66 Section 4.Subsection (13) of section 480.043, Florida 67 Statutes, is amended to read: 68 480.043Massage establishments; requisites; licensure; 69 inspection; human trafficking awareness training and policies. 70 (13)By January 1, 2025 2021, a massage establishment shall 71 implement a procedure for reporting suspected human trafficking 72 to the Florida Human Trafficking Hotline, 1-855-FLA-SAFE, the 73 National Human Trafficking Hotline or to a local law enforcement 74 agency and shall post in a conspicuous place in the 75 establishment which is accessible to employees a sign with the 76 relevant provisions of the reporting procedure. 77 Section 5.Subsections (1) and (3) of section 509.096, 78 Florida Statutes, are amended to read: 79 509.096Human trafficking awareness training and policies 80 for employees of public lodging establishments; enforcement. 81 (1)A public lodging establishment shall: 82 (a)Provide annual training regarding human trafficking 83 awareness to employees of the establishment who perform 84 housekeeping duties in the rental units or who work at the front 85 desk or reception area where guests ordinarily check in or check 86 out. Such training must also be provided for new employees 87 within 60 days after they begin their employment in those roles, 88 or by January 1, 2021, whichever occurs later. Each employee 89 must submit to the hiring establishment a signed and dated 90 acknowledgment of having received the training, which the 91 establishment must provide to the Department of Business and 92 Professional Regulation upon request. The establishment may keep 93 such acknowledgment electronically. 94 (b)By January 1, 2021, Implement a procedure for the 95 reporting of suspected human trafficking to the National Human 96 Trafficking Hotline or to a local law enforcement agency. 97 (c)By January 1, 2025 2021, post in a conspicuous location 98 in the establishment which is accessible to employees a human 99 trafficking public awareness sign at least 11 inches by 15 100 inches in size, printed in an easily legible font and in at 101 least 32-point type, which states in English and Spanish and any 102 other language predominantly spoken in that area which the 103 department deems appropriate substantially the following: 104 105 If you or someone you know is being forced to engage in an 106 activity and cannot leave, whether it is prostitution, 107 housework, farm work, factory work, retail work, restaurant 108 work, or any other activity, call the Florida Human Trafficking 109 Hotline, 1-855-FLA-SAFE, the National Human Trafficking Resource 110 Center at 888-373-7888 or text INFO or HELP to 233-733 to access 111 help and services. Victims of slavery and human trafficking are 112 protected under United States and Florida law. 113 (3)For a violation committed on or after July 1, 2023, The 114 division shall impose an administrative fine of $2,000 per day 115 on a public lodging establishment that is not in compliance with 116 this section and remit the fines to the direct-support 117 organization established under s. 16.618, unless the division 118 receives adequate written documentation from the public lodging 119 establishment which provides assurance that each deficiency will 120 be corrected within 45 days after the division provided the 121 public lodging establishment with notice of its violation. For a 122 second or subsequent violation of this subsection committed on 123 or after July 1, 2023, the division may not provide a correction 124 period to a public lodging establishment and must impose the 125 applicable administrative fines. 126 Section 6.Subsection (13) is added to section 787.06, 127 Florida Statutes, to read: 128 787.06Human trafficking. 129 (13)When a contract is executed, renewed, or extended 130 between a nongovernmental entity and a governmental entity, the 131 nongovernmental entity must provide the governmental entity with 132 an affidavit signed by an officer or a representative of the 133 nongovernmental entity under penalty of perjury attesting that 134 the nongovernmental entity does not use coercion for labor or 135 services as defined in this section. For purposes of this 136 subsection, the term governmental entity has the same meaning 137 as in s. 287.138(1). 138 Section 7.Subsection (4) of section 787.29, Florida 139 Statutes, is amended to read: 140 787.29Human trafficking public awareness signs. 141 (4)The required public awareness sign must be at least 8.5 142 inches by 11 inches in size, must be printed in at least a 16 143 point type, and must state substantially the following in 144 English and Spanish: 145 146 If you or someone you know is being forced to engage in an 147 activity and cannot leavewhether it is prostitution, housework, 148 farm work, factory work, retail work, restaurant work, or any 149 other activitycall the Florida Human Trafficking Hotline, 1 150 855-FLA-SAFE, the National Human Trafficking Resource Center at 151 1-888-373-7888 or text INFO or HELP to 233-733 to access help 152 and services. Victims of slavery and human trafficking are 153 protected under United States and Florida law. 154 Section 8.This act shall take effect July 1, 2024.