|
05/30/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-209
|
|
|
|
05/29/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/21/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|