Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0808 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024