Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 799
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted HB 799
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/08/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|