Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0814 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024