Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | CS by Education Pre-K -12 read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | CS by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/11/2023 | Filed |