Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0820 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 12, 2024
Bill January 18, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024