Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 215
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 215
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|