Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0846 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 18, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 18, 2024