House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|