Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0864 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024