Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 781
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 781
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/22/24, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|