Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0870 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 23, 2024