Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 01/17/2024 | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/12/2023 | Filed |