Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0884 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Analysis

Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 16, 2024