|
05/20/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-196
|
|
|
|
05/17/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/07/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (018011)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 018011 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendment(s) adopted (328282)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|