Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0892 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024