Senate | 03/08/2024 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/04/2024 | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules | ||
Senate | 12/13/2023 | Filed |