Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0894 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024