Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 197
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 197
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|