Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0896 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024