Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 715
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 715
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/22/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/22/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|