Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0910 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024