House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/13/24, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|