Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0932 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024