Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/08/24, 10:45 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
CS by Transportation read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
CS by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/23/24, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|