Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0934 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 12, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 24, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024