|
04/12/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-76
|
|
|
|
04/11/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/02/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/21/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Now in Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Transportation; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|