Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0968 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2024
Analysis February 20, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024