|
04/26/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-106
|
|
|
|
04/24/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/22/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/21/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Remaining references corrected to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Original reference(s) removed: Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/29/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|