Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0988 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2024
Bill January 30, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024