|
05/13/2024
|
Chapter No. 2024-170
|
|
|
|
05/10/2024
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/25/2024
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/14/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/07/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/30/24, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Environment and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Environment and Natural Resources; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|