Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0998 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 30, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024