LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
S1006
Draft Versions
FL
Florida Senate Bill S1006
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2024 Regular Session
Florida Senate Bill S1006
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 19, 2023
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
February 28, 2024
Analysis
February 26, 2024
Analysis
February 22, 2024
Analysis
February 19, 2024
Analysis
February 6, 2024
Analysis
February 2, 2024
Comm Sub
Bill
February 22, 2024
Compare
Bill
February 6, 2024
Compare