Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 85
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 85
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2024
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2024
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/16/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|