Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 17, 2024
Analysis January 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024