Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 923
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 923
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/06/24, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Now in Banking and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2024
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/29/24, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred to Judiciary; Banking and Insurance; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|