Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1064 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2024