House
|
03/08/2024
|
Died in returning Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Requested House to recede
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (325533)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 112, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment 325533 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/5/2024)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/15/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/30/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Referred to Health Policy; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|