Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1112 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 31, 2024
Analysis January 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill January 31, 2024