Senate | 03/05/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 583 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Substituted CS/HB 583 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24 | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/14/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Remaining references corrected to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Original reference(s) removed: Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/02/2024 | Filed |