Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1134 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 2, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 2, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 6, 2024