Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1065
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1065
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/29/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/24, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
CS/CS by Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services, 02/13/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/06/24, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Committee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/02/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|