Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1180 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 2, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 26, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 6, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 26, 2024
Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis February 12, 2024
Analysis February 6, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024