Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to HB 1131
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Substituted HB 1131
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/15/24, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/08/24, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/23/2024
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|