Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1190 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2024
Analysis February 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024