Senate | 02/22/2024 | Laid on Table, refer to HB 1147 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Substituted HB 1147 | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/22/24 | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/08/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/24/2024 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 01/23/2024 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/23/24, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Now in Commerce and Tourism | ||
Senate | 01/16/2024 | Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/08/2024 | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/03/2024 | Filed |