Florida 2024 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1218 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2024
Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 23, 2024
Analysis January 22, 2024
Analysis January 16, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024