Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 135
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Substituted CS/HB 135
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/24
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/27/24, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/20/24, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2024
|
On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/05/24, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2024
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2024
|
Referred to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|